Dunn v. Pinkis Pub, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2015-cv-00535 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/23/2015
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1815505, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Patrick Dunn.
1
Summons-Alkesh
2
Summons-Bhupat
3
Summons Pinkis Pub
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112248706" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112248706','58384','7','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Disclosure Statement) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2015: #
5
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112249332" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112249332','58384','7','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
5 Attachments
2
10/26/2015
Summons Issued as to Alkesh Vijay Patel, Bhupat R. Patel, Pinkis Pub, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
10/26/2015
Service Notice entered 10/26/2015. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/7/2015.
4
11/02/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Dunn. Bhupat R. Patel served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015
5
11/02/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Dunn. Alkesh Vijay Patel served on 10/29/2015, answer due 11/19/2015
6
11/17/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Dunn. Pinkis Pub, Inc. served on 11/13/2015, answer due 12/4/2015
7
11/23/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Abner Riley Powell, IV on behalf of Alkesh Vijay Patel, Bhupat R. Patel, Pinkis Pub, Inc.
8
11/23/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Alkesh Vijay Patel, Bhupat R. Patel, Pinkis Pub, Inc.
9
11/24/2015
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/24/2015. (Attachment: # 1 consent form)
10
12/16/2015
Order, VACATING 9 Preliminary Scheduling Order, and STAYING discovery. Plaintiff's answer to Court's Interrogatories (Exhibit A) due 1/11/2016. Defendants shall permit Plaintiff's counsel and expert reasonable access to inspect facility within 30 days from Defendants' receipt of Plaintiff's Interrogatory responses. Plaintiff's expert's report due 45 days after inspection of facility. Defendants' written response to expert's report due 30 days after receipt of report. Parties are to either mediate dispute, or file a request for a settlement conference with the Court 30 days after submission of Defendants' written response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/16/2015. (mab) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/16/2015)
11
01/11/2016
NOTICE by Patrick Dunn re 10 Order, Set Deadlines, Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories
01/11/2016
REFERRAL OF 11 Notice of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories to Judge Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
04/21/2016
MOTION for Settlement Conference by Patrick Dunn.
04/21/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 12 MOTION for Settlement Conference Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/27/2016
Set Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/28/2016 at 3:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/28/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 4/28/2016. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
05/02/2016
Order re: parties' 12 Joint Motion for Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 6/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Each party is to submit to the undersigned in chambers by 5:00 PM on 5/27/2016, a confidential settlement statement as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/2/2016.
15
05/24/2016
NOTICE of Settlement by Patrick Dunn
16
05/25/2016
NOTICE of Endorsement by Alkesh Vijay Patel, Pinkis Pub, Inc., Bhupat R. Patel
17
05/26/2016
Order re: 15 Joint Notice of Settlement, it is ORDERED that the parties either file a joint stipulation of dismissal or a notice advising of the status of settlement not later than 8/22/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/25/2016.
18
08/30/2016
ORDER, On or before September 6, 2016, the parties are ORDERED to show cause why they have not complied with this Court's 17 Order. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/30/2016.
19
09/01/2016
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Patrick Dunn.
20
09/02/2016
NOTICE of Endorsement by Alkesh Vijay Patel, Pinkis Pub, Inc., Bhupat R. Patel
09/02/2016
REFERRAL OF 19 Stipulation of Dismissal and 20 Notice of Endorsement to Senior Judge Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
09/02/2016
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party shall bear his or it own costs. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/2/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.