Dunn v. npc International Inc., et al. (consent)

2:2015-cv-00144 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 482 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/03/2015
COMPLAINT against NPC International Inc. and Realty Income Corp. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602035907.), filed by Patrick Dunn.
1
Filing fee receipt
1 Attachment
2
03/03/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick Dunn.
3
03/05/2015
Summons Issued as to NPC International Inc. and Realty Income Corp.; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 Complaint.
03/05/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to both counsel for Patrick Dunn (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
03/11/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of 3 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by Laura Payne for NPC International Inc. served on 3/9/2015, answer due 3/30/2015.
5
03/11/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of 3 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by Avery Harris for Realty Income Corp. served on 3/9/2015, answer due 3/30/2015.
6
03/30/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by NPC International Inc.
7
03/30/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Realty Income Corp.
8
03/30/2015
Motion for Thomas L. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NPC International Inc., Realty Income Corp.
9
03/30/2015
Motion for Audrey M. Calkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NPC International Inc., Realty Income Corp.
10
03/30/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to NPC International Inc. and Realty Income Corp. Corporate Disclosures due by 4/9/2015.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
03/30/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for NPC International Inc., Realty Income Corp. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/30/2015
***Attorney Thomas L Henderson for NPC International Inc. and Realty Income Corp. added pursuant to 8 Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/30/2015
***Attorney Audrey Calkins for NPC International Inc. and Realty Income Corp. added. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
03/31/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by NPC International Inc. re 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
12
03/31/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Realty Income Corp. re 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
13
03/31/2015
Filing fee re 8 Motion for Thomas L. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 9 Motion for Audrey M. Calkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $ 100.00, receipt number 4602036227
14
04/02/2015
ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the Motion for Thomas L. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Doc. 8), and the Motion for Audrey M. Calkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Doc. 9), including the supporting documents and receipt of the applicable fees, and pursuant to Local Rule 83.1(b), it is ORDERED that the Motions (Doc. 8 & 9) are GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on April 2, 2015.
15
04/23/2015
ORDER directing that, on or before May 14, 2015, each party shall complete and file with the Clerk of the Court the attached form in order to confirm the party's consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, as further set out; further ORDERED that the Rule 26(f), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than May 21, 2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on April 23, 2015.
16
05/20/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
17
05/21/2015
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by NPC International Inc. and Realty Income Corp.
18
05/21/2015
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Dunn.
19
05/28/2015
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER setting: Final Pretrial Conference for 02/09/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A, the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama, before the undersigned Magistrate Judge; Non-Jury Trial for 03/14/2016 in Montgomery, Alabama; Amended Pleadings due from plaintiff by 06/05/2015 and from defendants by 6/12/2015; Discovery due by 09/30/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2015; Mediation Notice due by 10/05/2015; as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on May 28, 2015. (Furnished to Calendar/KF)
20
08/24/2015
Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline Expert Disclosures by Patrick Dunn, NPC International Inc., Realty Income Corp. Modified on 8/25/2015 to add as also filed on behalf of the dfts.
21
08/25/2015
ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion for 14 Day Extension of Deadlines; the parties have fourteen additional days to provide Rule 26(a) expert disclosures. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/25/2015.
22
10/08/2015
MOTION to Dismiss by Patrick Dunn.
23
10/13/2015
ORDER directing Defendants TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the 22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Patrick Dunn should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 10/19/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 10/13/2015.
24
10/13/2015
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by NPC International Inc., Realty Income Corp. re 23 Order to Show Cause.
25
10/20/2015
ORDER that the Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. A separate judgment shall issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 10/20/2015. (Deadlines terminated: Non-Jury Trial set for 3/14/2016 and Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2016.) Copies furnished to calendar, KG.
26
10/20/2015
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff with each party to bear its own costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as afinal judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 10/20/2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.