Duron v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00147 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 530 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/05/2017
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt # 08453G), filed by Deidre Leanora Duron.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
2
07/06/2017
Civil Cover Sheet
07/06/2017
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/05/2017
Unissued summons re Defendant Nancy Berryhill
1
Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney General
2
Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney
2 Attachments
4
07/06/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2357588.) by Deidre Leanora Duron.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
6
07/26/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill
08/01/2017
Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket 7, when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/02/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deidre Leanora Duron. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017.
9
09/07/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Ann Miller on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill
10
09/22/2017
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.
11
09/22/2017
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
Certification Page 08-28-2017
2
Court Transcript Index 08-28-2017
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearin
4
Payment Documents and Decisions 03-21-2015
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 03-21-2015
6
Non Disability Related Development 03-21-2015
7
Disability Related Development 03-21-2015
8
Medical Records 03-21-2015 Part 1
9
Medical Records 03-21-2015 Part 2
10
Medical Records 03-21-2015 Part 3
11
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearin
12
Payment Documents and Decisions 08-28-2017
13
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 08-28-2017
14
Disability Related Development 08-28-2017
15
Medical Records 08-28-2017 Part 1
16
Medical Records 08-28-2017 Part 2
17
Medical Records 08-28-2017 Part 3
18
Medical Records 08-28-2017 Part 4
18 Attachments
12
10/23/2017
MOTION to Remand to Social Security by Deidre Leanora Duron.
13
11/09/2017
NOTICE of Substitution by Nancy A. Berryhill
14
11/22/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re [12] MOTION to Remand to Social Security filed by Nancy A. Berryhill.
15
12/06/2017
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Deidre Leanora Duron.
18
05/15/2018
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Deidre Leanora Duron.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
19
05/15/2018
DECLARATION of Edward A. Wicklund, Esq. re [18] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Deidre Leanora Duron.
1
Exhibit A All Professional Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Law Clerk Time
4
Exhibit D Paralegal Time
5
Exhibit E Expenses
6
Exhibit F Costs
7
Exhibit G Fee Agreement
8
Exhibit H Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
9
Memorandum in Support
10
Certificate of Service
10 Attachments
20
05/24/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.