Dustin James Connor-Steele and Alexandria Leigh Connor-Steele
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00002 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/03/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/03/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
01/03/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/03/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
01/03/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
01/03/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
01/03/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
7
01/03/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
01/04/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/04/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
9
01/04/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
10
01/04/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
11
01/04/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
12
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
01/07/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
16
01/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
01/15/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
18
01/23/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
19
01/24/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
20
01/24/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
21
01/24/2019
Certificate of Service
22
02/01/2019
Generic Motion / Application
23
02/01/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
24
02/01/2019
Certificate of Service
25
02/01/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
26
02/01/2019
Certificate of Service
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
02/05/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
28
02/05/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
29
02/11/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
30
02/11/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
31
02/11/2019
Certificate of Service
32
02/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
02/25/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
34
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
35
03/08/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
36
03/13/2019
Proceeding Memo
37
03/13/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
03/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
39
03/20/2019
Certificate of No Objection
40
03/20/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
41
03/26/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
42
03/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
43
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
44
04/10/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
45
04/10/2019
Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.