Dustin Lee Campbell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00256 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/07/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
08/07/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/08/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
6
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
7
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
08/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/22/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/24/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
12
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/28/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
08/30/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
09/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/12/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
15
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
09/13/2018
Calendar Remark (Settled / Removed) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
09/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
18
09/27/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
10/01/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.