Dwight Earl Brown, jr. and Lakisha Mickens Brown
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00436 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/02/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Lakisha Mickens Brown
2
02/02/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance. Filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown.
3
02/02/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown
5
02/02/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown.
6
02/02/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown.
7
02/02/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown.
8
02/02/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/07/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/01/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 05/07/2018.
9
02/03/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
10
02/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 02/04/2018.
11
02/05/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown, Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown).
12
02/07/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
13
02/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/07/2018.
14
02/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown, Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown). Notice Date 02/07/2018.
15
02/28/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
16
03/08/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 3/7/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
17
03/09/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
03/09/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 4/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
03/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/11/2018.
20
03/16/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Dwight E Brown, Debtor Filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown.
21
03/16/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Lakisha M Brown, co-Debtor Filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown Jr., Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown.
22
04/11/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
04/12/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 129.15 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00436-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (129.15) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21951917. Fee Amount 129.15 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
04/25/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 4/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Dwight Earl Brown, Joint Debtor Lakisha Mickens Brown, Motion to Avoid Lien (CM07), Motion to Avoid Lien (CM07), Motion to Avoid Lien (CM07), Motion to Avoid Lien (CM07), 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, The Trustees objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied.
24
04/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 04/27/2018.
06/11/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 129.15 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00436-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (129.15) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22163589. Fee Amount 129.15 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 51.70 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00436-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (51.70) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22267281. Fee Amount 51.70 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/11/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full
07/11/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 51.70 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00436-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (51.70) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22267281. Fee Amount 51.70 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/31/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, Successor by Merger to Wachovia Bank, NA
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan modification agreement
3 Attachments
27
07/31/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, Successor by Merger to Wachovia Bank, NA (RE: related document(s) 26 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
28
07/31/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A (RE: related document(s) 26 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, Successor by Merger to Wachovia Bank, NA). Hearing scheduled 8/28/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
07/31/2018
Clerk's Notice of Non-Payment of Filing Fees due in the amount of $181.00 by filer Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A for Relief from Stay. Said fees are to be paid within 2 business days from the date of this notice or Motion will be DENIED without prejudice. (RE: related document(s) 26 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, Successor by Merger to Wachovia Bank, NA). Filing Fees due by 8/3/2018.
07/31/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(18-00436-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22344239. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 26) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 08/02/2018.
32
08/28/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/28/2018 (RE: related document(s) 26 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, Successor by Merger to Wachovia Bank, NA). Hearing scheduled 9/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
08/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 08/30/2018.
34
09/20/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 26) Signed on 9/20/2018.
35
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 09/22/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.