E.S. et al v. State of Alaska, Department of Health and Social Services et al
Court Docket Sheet

1:2018-cv-00008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/22/2018
Notice of Removal
2
06/22/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
06/25/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/25/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
06/26/2018
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/27/2018
Preliminary Injunction
6
06/27/2018
Memorandum
06/27/2018
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/29/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
10
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
11
07/05/2018
Notice of Service List
12
07/06/2018
Dismiss
13
07/09/2018
Order Dismissing Case
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.