East Coast Underground LLC v. Daniel Utility Construction Inc
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2015-cv-00287 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 854 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/22/2015
COMPLAINT against Daniel Utility Construction Inc (Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT051535.), filed by East Coast Underground LLC. Summons issued.
1
https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/doc1/02713533626" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02713533626','100161','8','','2','0','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet)(ks) (Docket text modified on 6/21/2016 to correct Plaintiff's name.)
1 Attachment
2
05/22/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) filed by East Coast Underground LLC. (ks) (Docket text modified on 6/21/2016 to correct Plaintiff's name.)
3
06/05/2015
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons, filed by East Coast Underground LLC. Daniel Utility Construction Inc. served on 6/1/2015. (Docket text modified on 6/8/2015 to correct the individual served). (jak) (Docket text modified on 6/21/2016 to correct Plaintiff's name.)
06/08/2015
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 3 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as Daniel Utility Construction Inc. as marked on the document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
06/15/2015
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michelle Dressler & Brett Dressler. Fee $200.00 receipt number LIT051859. Filed by East Coast Underground LLC. (alm) (Docket text modified on 6/21/2016 to correct Plaintiff's name.)
5
06/16/2015
ORDER granting 4 motion for admission pro hac vice of Michelle Dressler and Brett Dressler. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 06/16/2015.
6
06/23/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against East Coast Underground LLC by Daniel Utility Construction Inc.
1
Exhibit) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2015: #
2
https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/doc1/02713556856" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02713556856','100161','25','','2','0','',''}};">2</a> Main Document - Correct (submitted 6/24/2015)) (jak) (Docket text modified on 6/21/2016 to correct Plaintiff's name.)
2 Attachments
7
06/24/2015
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of correct signature). The correct document was added to docket entry 6 based on the attached correspondence.
8
07/10/2015
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/31/2015. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/14/2015. Proposed bench trial date the week of 8/15/2016 in Little Rock. Signed at the direction of the Court.
9
07/13/2015
Plaintiff's ANSWER to 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, Counterclaim by East Coast Underground LLC. (Docket text modified on 6/21/2016 to correct Plaintiff's name.)
10
08/28/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Drake Mann on behalf of Daniel Utility Construction Inc
11
08/31/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Daniel Utility Construction Inc.
12
09/16/2015
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for the week of 8/15/2016 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Discovery due by 6/2/2016. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 7/26/2016. Status Report due by 6/16/2016. Signed at the direction of the Court.
06/21/2016
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 1 Complaint, 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 3 Affidavit of Service, 4 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice, 6 Counterclaim, and and 9 Answer to Counterclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text for each entry was modified to correct Plaintiff's name to be East Coast Underground LLC. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/21/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Cumming on behalf of Daniel Utility Construction Inc (Docket text modified on 6/22/2016 to correct the attorney filer).
14
06/21/2016
NOTICE by Daniel Utility Construction Inc OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL KATIE MIDDLETON
15
06/21/2016
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Daniel Utility Construction Inc.
16
06/22/2016
ORDER granting the 14 motion to withdraw Katie Middleton as counsel for the defendant. Katie Middleton is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/22/2016.
06/22/2016
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 13 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the attorney filer as Chad Cumming as marked on the document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/21/2016
ORDER: Bench trial will begin Wednesday, 8/17/2016, at 9:15 AM in Courtroom #4-D, Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, in Little Rock, Arkansas. Counsel should be present by 8:45 AM Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/21/2016.
18
07/26/2016
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by East Coast Underground LLC.
19
07/26/2016
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Daniel Utility Construction Inc.
20
07/28/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Drake Mann on behalf of Daniel Utility Construction Inc

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.