Eboni Tioka Little
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04834 (alnb)

Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 1/23/2018 (RE: related document(s) {{8}} Confirmation Hearing, {{16}} Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/6/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

17-04834-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Eboni Tioka Little } Case No: 17-04834-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-7237 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter came before the Court on Tuesday, January 23, 2018 11:00 AM, for a hearing on the following: 1) RE: Doc #16; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case 2) Confirmation Hearing Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: J. Suzanne Shinn, attorney for Eboni Tioka Little (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, staff attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on arguments of counsel and the filings, these matters are continued to February 6, 2018 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Dated: 01/23/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 23 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 12:47:04 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/16/2018 (RE: related document(s)[42] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA). Hearing scheduled 8/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

17-04834-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Eboni Tioka Little } Case No: 17-04834-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-7237 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter was scheduled for a hearing on Tuesday, July 17, 2018 10:00 AM on the following: RE: Doc #42; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank NA It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: By agreement of the parties, the matter is continued to August 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Further, the automatic stay provided for by Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code shall remain in effect. Dated: 07/16/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 58 Filed 07/16/18 Entered 07/16/18 16:24:13 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[58] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/18/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04834-DSC Eboni Tioka Little Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: mbrown Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Jul 16, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 12 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 18, 2018. db +Eboni Tioka Little, 5310 Whisper Wood Drive, Birmingham, AL 35226-1091 cr +Wells Fargo Bank NA, 1 Home Campus X2303-01a, Des Moines, IA 50328-0001 9553569 ++WELLS FARGO BANK NA, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE AMERICAS SERVICING, ATTN BANKRUPTCY DEPT MAC X7801-014, 3476 STATEVIEW BLVD, FORT MILL SC 29715-7203 (address filed with court: WELLS FARGO HM MORTGAGE, 8480 STAGECOACH CIRCLE, FREDERICK MD 21701) 9553568 +WELLS FARGO DEALER SERVICES, PO BOX 1697, WINTERVILLE NC 28590-1697 9553567 +WELLS FARGO DEALER SERVICES, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 19657, IRVINE CA 92623-9657 9553570 WELLS FARGO HM MORTGAGE, PO BOX 14411, DES MOINES IA 50306-3411 9553571 +WELLS FARGO HM MORTGAGE, %SIROTE & PERMUTT, 2311 HIGHLAND AVENUE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35205-2972 9603164 Wells Fargo Bank N.A., d/b/a Wells Fargo Dealer Se, PO Box 19657, Irvine, CA 92623-9657 9605269 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., C/O Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as servicer, Attn: Default Document Processing, N9286-01Y, 1000 Blue Gentian Road, Eagan, MN 55121-7700 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:42 Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital On, P.O. Box 165028, Irving, TX 75016-5028 cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:42 Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 cr E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@republicfinance.com Jul 17 2018 02:16:53 Republic Finance, LLC, 282 Tower Rd., Ponchatoula, LA 70454 TOTAL: 3 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 18, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 16, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Debtor Eboni Tioka Little pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA ndbankruptcy@sirote.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Eboni Tioka Little pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 4 Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 59 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/19/18 00:10:43 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 17-04834-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Eboni Tioka Little } Case No: 17-04834-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-7237 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter was scheduled for a hearing on Tuesday, July 17, 2018 10:00 AM on the following: RE: Doc #42; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank NA It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: By agreement of the parties, the matter is continued to August 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Further, the automatic stay provided for by Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code shall remain in effect. Dated: 07/16/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 59 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/19/18 00:10:43 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, cs)

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: CASE NO: 17-04834-DSC13 EBONI TIOKA LITTLE Debtor. TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMES NOW Bradford W. Caraway, Chapter 13 Standing Trustee, and moves this Honorable Court to dismiss the Debtor's case. As grounds therefore, the Trustee shows the following: 1. The Trustee files this motion pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1307(c). 2. There has been a material default by the Debtor with respect to a term of the confirmed plan. 3. The Debtor is not making plan payments as required by the Confirmation Order. WHEREFORE, the Trustee moves this Honorable Court to dismiss this case. The Trustee requests such other relief as the Court deems appropriate. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 (205) 323-4631 Certificate of Service I hereby certify that a correct copy of the foregoing motion has been forwarded by email or U.S. mail, to the following on this the 20th day of July, 2018: EBONI TIOKA LITTLE BOND, BOTES, REESE & SHINN, P.C. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway TRUSTEE EBONI TIOKA LITTLE 5310 WHISPER WOOD DRIVE BIRMINGHAM, AL 35226 Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 60 Filed 07/20/18 Entered 07/20/18 15:01:49 Desc Page 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s)[60] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

Van−022 [Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss] (Rev. 09/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04834−DSC13 Eboni Tioka Little Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−7237 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Notice is hereby given that a Trustee's Motion to Dismiss has been filed in this case. An evidentiary hearing will be held on 8/21/18 at 10:30 AM in Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 to consider and act upon the motion and any response. Notice is further given that if the Debtor or the Debtor's attorney fails to appear at this hearing, the trustee's motion may be granted without further notice. If the attorney for the Debtor fails to appear at this hearing, the Court may impose monetary sanctions or other appropriate sanctions; reduce the award of attorney's fees in the case; and/or require the attorney to disgorge a portion of the fees awarded and paid in the case. If the motion is not granted, the Court may order that: A. (1) if a deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 60 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice; or B. (1) if no deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 30 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice. Consent forms must be filed no later than 10:00 p.m. on the day preceeding the scheduled hearing day. If a consent form is not fully completed or is not timely filed, it will not be considered and attendance is required by the Debtor, the Debtor's Attorney and the Chapter 13 Trustee. DEBTORS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS SHOULD DRESS APPROPRIATELY TO APPEAR IN THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY COURT. Dated: July 23, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court dls Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 61 Filed 07/23/18 Entered 07/23/18 12:12:09 Desc Ntc of Hrg on Trt Motion to Di Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[61] Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 07/25/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04834-DSC Eboni Tioka Little Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 1 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 23, 2018 Form ID: van022 Total Noticed: 65 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 25, 2018. db +Eboni Tioka Little, 5310 Whisper Wood Drive, Birmingham, AL 35226-1091 cr +Wells Fargo Bank NA, 1 Home Campus X2303-01a, Des Moines, IA 50328-0001 9653498 AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY,, INC., C/O BECKET AND LEE LLP, PO BOX 3001, MALVERN PA 19355-0701 9553520 +AMEX, CORRESPONDENCE, PO BOX 981540, EL PASO TX 79998-1540 9553521 +AMEX, PO BOX 360001, FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33336-0001 9553522 ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA, 11 SOUTH UNION STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36104 9553523 +BIRMINGHAM WATER WORKS BOARD, %CBS COLLECTION DIVISION, PO BOX 3227, TUSCALOOSA AL 35403-3227 9553524 +BIRMINGHAM WATER WORKS BOARD, %CBS COLLECTION DIVISION, 550 GREENSBORO AVENUE STE 3, TUSCALOOSA AL 35401-1547 9553525 +BLUE TRUST LOANS, 9790 NORTH COUNTY ROAD K STE., HAYWARD WI 54843-4251 9553526 +CADENCE BANK, %CBS COLLECTION DIVISION, PO BOX 3227, TUSCALOOSA AL 35403-3227 9553527 +CADENCE BANK, %CBS COLLECTION DIVISION, 550 GREENSBORO AVENUE, STE 3, TUSCALOOSA AL 35401-1547 9553533 +FIRST BANK OF DELAWARE, %MIDWEST RECOVERY SYSTEMS, 2747 W CLAY STREET STE. A, SAINT CHARLES MO 63301-2557 9553532 +FIRST BANK OF DELAWARE, %MIDWEST RECOVERY SYSTEMS, PO BOX 899, FLORISSANT MO 63032-0899 9553534 FIRTS PREMIER BANK, 601 S MINNEAPOLIS AVE, SIOUX FALLS SD 57104 9553535 +FIRTS PREMIER BANK, 3820 N LOUISE AVENUE, SIOUX FALLS SD 57107-0145 9553537 INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, 401 W PEACHTREE STREET NW, ROOM 1665, STOP 334-D, ATLANTA GA 30308 9553541 +MID AMERICA BK/TOTAL C, 5109 S BROADBAND LANE, SIOUX FALLS SD 57108-2208 9553543 +ONEMAIN FINANCIAL INC, %ATLANTOC CREDIT & FINANCE, PO BOX 13386, ROANOKE VA 24033-3386 9553544 +ONEMAIN FINANCIAL INC, %ATLANTOC CREDIT & FINANCE, 3353 ORANGE AVE, ROANOKE VA 24012-6335 9553545 +ORTHOPEDIC GROUP OF BIRMINGHAM, %I C SYSTEM INC, PO BOX 64378, SAINT PAUL MN 55164-0378 9553547 +QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC., %AMCA/AMERICAN MED COLLEC. AG, 269 S SAW MILL, ELMSFORD NY 10523-1916 9553546 +QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC., %AMCA/AMERICAN MED COLLEC. AG, ATTENTION: BANKRUPTCY, 4 WESTCHESTER PLAZA, SUITE 110, ELMSFORD NY 10523-1615 9553549 +RISE, %NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, 327 W 4TH AVE, PO BOX 3023, HUTCHINSON KS 67504-3023 9553551 +SOUTHERN CARE INTERNAL MEDICAL, %HOLLOWAY CREDIT SOLUTIONS, PO BOX 230609, MONTGOMERY AL 36123-0609 9553550 +SOUTHERN CARE INTERNAL MEDICAL, %HOLLOWAY CREDIT SOLUTIONS, PO BOX 6441, DOTHAN AL 36302-6441 9553552 +SPEEDYCASH.COM/ADVANCE AMERICA, %AD ASTRA RECOVERY, 7330 W 33RD STREET N, STE 118, WICHITA KS 67205-9370 9553553 +SPEEDYCASH.COM/ADVANCE AMERICA, %AD ASTRA RECOVERY, 8918 W 21ST STREET N. PMB303, STE. 200, WICHITA KS 67205-1885 9553554 SPRINT, %DIVERSIFIED CONSULTANTS, 10550 DEERWOOD BLVD., JACKSONVILLE FL 32256 9553556 +STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPT INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS, 649 MONROE STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36131-0001 9553558 +UC IRVINE HEALTH, %PROGRESSIVE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, PO BOX 2220, WEST COVINA CA 91793-2220 9553559 +UCI PHYSICIANS BILLING GROUP, %CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, 3075 E IMPERIAL HWY STE 200, BREA CA 92821-6753 9553560 +US ATTORNEY, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, 1801 FOURTH AVENUE NORTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35203-2101 9553561 +US ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, 950 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE, WASHINGTON DC 20530-0009 9553563 US DEPT ED, PO BOX 4222, IOWA CITY IA 52244 9553564 +US DEPT ED, PO BOX 7860, MADISON WI 53707-7860 9553562 +US DEPT ED, ECMC/BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 16408, ST PAUL MN 55116-0408 9553565 +US DEPT ED, %WINDHAM PROFESSIONALS, PO BOX 400, EAST AURORA NY 14052-0400 9715750 US Department of Education, PO Box 16448, St. Paul, MN 55116-0448 9553566 +VULCAN IMAGING ASSOCIATES, %CBBI, PO BOX 590, BESSEMER AL 35021-0590 9553569 ++WELLS FARGO BANK NA, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE AMERICAS SERVICING, ATTN BANKRUPTCY DEPT MAC X7801-014, 3476 STATEVIEW BLVD, FORT MILL SC 29715-7203 (address filed with court: WELLS FARGO HM MORTGAGE, 8480 STAGECOACH CIRCLE, FREDERICK MD 21701) 9553568 +WELLS FARGO DEALER SERVICES, PO BOX 1697, WINTERVILLE NC 28590-1697 9553567 +WELLS FARGO DEALER SERVICES, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 19657, IRVINE CA 92623-9657 9553570 WELLS FARGO HM MORTGAGE, PO BOX 14411, DES MOINES IA 50306-3411 9553571 +WELLS FARGO HM MORTGAGE, %SIROTE & PERMUTT, 2311 HIGHLAND AVENUE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35205-2972 9603164 Wells Fargo Bank N.A., d/b/a Wells Fargo Dealer Se, PO Box 19657, Irvine, CA 92623-9657 9605269 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., C/O Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as servicer, Attn: Default Document Processing, N9286-01Y, 1000 Blue Gentian Road, Eagan, MN 55121-7700 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 24 2018 02:40:26 Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital On, P.O. Box 165028, Irving, TX 75016-5028 cr +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 24 2018 02:40:25 Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 07/25/18 Entered 07/26/18 00:13:04 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 2 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 23, 2018 Form ID: van022 Total Noticed: 65 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (continued) 9586625 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Jul 24 2018 02:50:36 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, Alabama 36132-0001 9665510 +E-mail/Text: bnc@atlasacq.com Jul 24 2018 02:46:43 Atlas Acquisitions LLC, 294 Union St., Hackensack, NJ 07601-4303 9553528 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.COAF.EBN@Americaninfosource.com Jul 24 2018 02:41:33 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 30285, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0285 9553529 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.COAF.EBN@Americaninfosource.com Jul 24 2018 02:40:37 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE, 3901 DALLAS PARKWAY, PLANO TX 75093-7864 9553530 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.COAF.EBN@Americaninfosource.com Jul 24 2018 02:40:38 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE, PO BOX 60511, CITY OF INDUSTRY CA 91716-0511 9600154 +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 24 2018 02:40:26 Capital One Auto Finance, AIS Portfolio Services, 4515 N Santa Fe Ave Dept APS, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-7901 9556615 +E-mail/PDF: acg.acg.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 24 2018 02:41:21 Capital One Auto Finance, c/o AIS Portfolio Servic, P.O. Box 4360, Houston, TX 77210-4360 9553531 +E-mail/Text: mrdiscen@discover.com Jul 24 2018 02:46:31 DISCOVER FINANCIAL, PO BOX 3025, NEW ALBANY OH 43054-3025 9553536 E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Jul 24 2018 02:47:06 INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 9553540 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydepartment@tsico.com Jul 24 2018 02:50:24 MEDEXPRESS URGENT CARE PA, %TRANSWORLD SYS INC/51, 500 VIRGINIA DR STE 514, FORT WASHINGTON PA 19034-2707 9553539 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydepartment@tsico.com Jul 24 2018 02:50:24 MEDEXPRESS URGENT CARE PA, %TRANSWORLD SYS INC/51, PO BOX 15618, WILMINGTON DE 19850-5618 9553542 +E-mail/PDF: cbp@onemainfinancial.com Jul 24 2018 02:40:09 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 3251, EVANSVILLE IN 47731-3251 9609588 +E-mail/Text: JCAP_BNC_Notices@jcap.com Jul 24 2018 02:49:35 Premier Bankcard, Llc, Jefferson Capital Systems LLC Assignee, Po Box 7999, Saint Cloud Mn 56302-7999 9553548 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@republicfinance.com Jul 24 2018 02:50:51 Republic Finance, 282 Tower Rd, Ponchatoula, LA 70454 9553555 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Jul 24 2018 02:50:36 STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, PO BOX 320001, MONTGOMERY AL 36132-0001 9553557 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@pmscollects.com Jul 24 2018 02:50:52 UC IRVINE HEALTH, %PROGRESSIVE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, 1521 W CAMERON AVE, FIRST FLOOR, WEST COVINA CA 91790-2738 9600558 E-mail/PDF: EBN_AIS@AMERICANINFOSOURCE.COM Jul 24 2018 02:43:00 Verizon, by American InfoSource LP as agent, PO Box 248838, Oklahoma City, OK 73124-8838 TOTAL: 19 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr* ++REPUBLIC FINANCE LLC, 282 TOWER RD, PONCHATOULA LA 70454-8318 (address filed with court: Republic Finance, LLC, 282 Tower Rd., Ponchatoula, LA 70454) 9553538* ++INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CENTRALIZED INSOLVENCY OPERATIONS, PO BOX 7346, PHILADELPHIA PA 19101-7346 (address filed with court: IRS SPECIAL PROCEDURES STAFF, COLLECTION DIVISION, 801 TOM MARTIN DRIVE STOP 126, BIRMINGHAM AL 35211) TOTALS: 0, * 2, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 25, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 07/25/18 Entered 07/26/18 00:13:04 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 3 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 23, 2018 Form ID: van022 Total Noticed: 65 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 23, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Debtor Eboni Tioka Little pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA ndbankruptcy@sirote.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Eboni Tioka Little pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 4 Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 07/25/18 Entered 07/26/18 00:13:04 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 4 Van−022 [Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss] (Rev. 09/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04834−DSC13 Eboni Tioka Little Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−7237 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Notice is hereby given that a Trustee's Motion to Dismiss has been filed in this case. An evidentiary hearing will be held on 8/21/18 at 10:30 AM in Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 to consider and act upon the motion and any response. Notice is further given that if the Debtor or the Debtor's attorney fails to appear at this hearing, the trustee's motion may be granted without further notice. If the attorney for the Debtor fails to appear at this hearing, the Court may impose monetary sanctions or other appropriate sanctions; reduce the award of attorney's fees in the case; and/or require the attorney to disgorge a portion of the fees awarded and paid in the case. If the motion is not granted, the Court may order that: A. (1) if a deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 60 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice; or B. (1) if no deduction order is entered in this case and (2) a payment is not received by the Trustee within 30 days from the date of the hearing and (3) unless scheduled payments are received timely by the Trustee for 12 months from the date of the hearing, the Trustee may notify the Court of the continuing default and the case may be dismissed without further notice. Consent forms must be filed no later than 10:00 p.m. on the day preceeding the scheduled hearing day. If a consent form is not fully completed or is not timely filed, it will not be considered and attendance is required by the Debtor, the Debtor's Attorney and the Chapter 13 Trustee. DEBTORS AND THEIR ATTORNEYS SHOULD DRESS APPROPRIATELY TO APPEAR IN THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY COURT. Dated: July 23, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court dls Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 07/25/18 Entered 07/26/18 00:13:04 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 4

Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # [42]) Signed on 8/9/2018.

17-04834-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Eboni Tioka Little } Case No: 17-04834-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-7237 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER CONDITIONALLY DENYING This matter came before the Court on Tuesday, August 07, 2018 10:00 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #42; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank NA Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Thomas Tutten, attorney for Wells Fargo Bank NA J. Suzanne Shinn, attorney for Eboni Tioka Little (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, staff attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on the filings and arguments of counsel, and for the reasons set forth on the record during the hearing, the Motion for Relief from Stay is denied conditioned upon the Debtor resuming the regular monthly mortgage payments directly to the Movant beginning with the August 2018 payment. The Movant has leave to file a claim for the postpetition mortgage arrearage, including fees and costs, through July 2018. In the event of future default, the Movant may file a pleading to renew its motion and a hearing will be scheduled by subsequent notice. Dated: 08/09/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04834-DSC13 Doc 63 Filed 08/09/18 Entered 08/09/18 10:45:02 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 94 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/09/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Eboni Tioka Little
2
11/09/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little.
4
11/09/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little.
5
11/09/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little.
11/09/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04834-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21383217. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/09/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little.
7
11/09/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little.
8
11/09/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/23/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/08/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/12/2018.
9
11/10/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
11/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/11/2017.
11
11/15/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
12
11/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little). Notice Date 11/15/2017.
13
11/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/15/2017.
14
12/13/2017
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/20/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, bc)
15
12/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
12/27/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
12/27/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
12/28/2017
Objection to Claim # 2 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $21,026.36 Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little. (Shinn, J.)
19
12/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/29/2017.
20
01/02/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little). Hearing scheduled 2/6/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
22
01/05/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a divison of Capital One, N.A. c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
23
01/23/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 1/23/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/6/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
01/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/25/2018.
25
02/05/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 2 Signed on 2/5/2018 (RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little).
26
02/05/2018
Objection to Claim # 6 of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in the amount of $16,277.87 Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little. (Shinn, J.)
27
02/06/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
28
02/07/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/7/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
29
02/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 02/07/2018.
30
02/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/08/2018.
31
02/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/09/2018.
32
03/13/2018
Affidavit Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim). (Shinn, J.)
33
03/15/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
34
03/16/2018
Order the Objection is sustained in part, and the secured portion of Claim No. 6 in the amount of $13,050.00 is hereby disallowed. The unsecured portion of claim no. 6 is allowed as filed in the amount of $3,227.87. Signed on 3/16/2018 (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little).
35
03/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 03/18/2018.
36
03/21/2018
Motion to Distribute Funds Filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little (Shinn, J.)
37
03/22/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 3/22/2018 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little, 16 Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn).
38
03/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 03/24/2018.
39
03/27/2018
Notice and Order Granting Signed on 3/27/2018 (RE: related document(s) 36 Motion to Distribute Funds filed by Debtor Eboni Tioka Little).
40
03/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Notice and Order). Notice Date 03/29/2018.
41
04/27/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA.
42
05/08/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan modification agreement
3 Attachments
43
05/08/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
05/08/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04834-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22044446. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 42) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
05/09/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank NA (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA). Hearing scheduled 6/12/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
47
05/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 05/11/2018.
48
05/14/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Republic Finance, LLC.
49
06/01/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 15 of Alabama Dept of Labor in the amount of $345.84 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
50
06/01/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 49 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
51
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 50 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/03/2018.
52
06/11/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/11/2018 (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA). Hearing scheduled 7/17/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
53
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 52 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/13/2018.
54
07/10/2018
Amended Objection to Claim # 15 of Alabama Department of Labor in the amount of $345.84 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
55
07/11/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/11/2018 (RE: related document(s) 49 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
56
07/11/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 54 Amended Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
57
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 55 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/13/2018.
58
07/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/16/2018 (RE: related document(s)[42] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank NA). Hearing scheduled 8/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
59
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[58] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/18/2018.
60
07/20/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, cs)
61
07/23/2018
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s)[60] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 8/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
62
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[61] Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 07/25/2018.
63
08/09/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # [42]) Signed on 8/9/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.