Eden D. Bryan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00118 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/29/2018
Request for Special Notice
doc
05/29/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
doc
05/29/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
05/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/29/2018
Certificate of Service
17
06/05/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
06/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/22/2018
Certificate of No Objection
19
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
20
06/25/2018
Relief from Stay
06/26/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
07/17/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
23
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/20/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.