Edmondson v. Corbett
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00271 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/16/2018
Notice of Removal
2
11/16/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
11/16/2018
Declaration
4
11/16/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
5
11/27/2018
Order
6
12/05/2018
Notice of Service List
7
12/05/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
8
12/06/2018
Notice of Service List
9
12/11/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
10
12/20/2018
Notice (Other)
11
12/21/2018
Order
12
01/04/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
13
01/08/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.