Edward Allen Kuhns
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00283 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
67
06/05/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
68
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
69
06/20/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
70
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/25/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.