Edward Michael Brown and Heidi Maria Brown
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00067 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/05/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event)
2
03/05/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
03/05/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
03/05/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
03/05/2019
Entry of Appearance
03/05/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/05/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/05/2019
Entry of Appearance
8
03/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
03/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
03/15/2019
Extend Time
11
03/20/2019
Entry of Appearance
12
03/27/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
03/27/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/27/2019
Affidavit
14
03/27/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
03/27/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
03/29/2019
Extend Time
03/29/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
04/03/2019
Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )
18
04/03/2019
Ch 11 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122B)
19
04/03/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
20
04/03/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
21
04/03/2019
Equity Security Holders
22
04/03/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
04/03/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
04/03/2019
Entry of Appearance
24
04/09/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
25
04/09/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
04/09/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
04/11/2019
Notice of Non-Appointment of Creditors Committee
04/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
04/11/2019
Hearing
28
04/11/2019
Certificate of Service
29
04/16/2019
Monthly Operating Report
30
04/16/2019
Document
31
04/16/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
32
04/16/2019
Affidavit

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.