Edwina O Butler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80163 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
10/03/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
doc
12/04/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
47
12/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
doc
01/04/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.