Eichorst v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00098 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
06/26/2018
Witness List
13
07/19/2018
Continue
14
07/19/2018
Declaration
15
08/01/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
16
08/27/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
17
09/12/2018
Status Report
18
09/14/2018
Order
19
09/27/2018
Status Report
20
09/28/2018
Scheduling Order
21
10/01/2018
Pretrial Order
22
11/01/2018
Witness List
23
11/21/2018
Leave to File Document
24
11/21/2018
Declaration
25
11/21/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
26
11/21/2018
Partial Summary Judgment
27
12/11/2018
Leave to File Document
28
12/11/2018
Declaration
29
12/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
30
12/19/2018
Leave to File Document
31
12/19/2018
Declaration
32
12/20/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
33
12/21/2018
Notice (Other)
34
12/26/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
35
01/07/2019
Order
36
01/11/2019
Order
37
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
38
02/06/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
39
02/06/2019
Leave to File Document
40
02/06/2019
Declaration
02/07/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
02/07/2019
Status Report
43
02/07/2019
Order
44
02/11/2019
ORDER denying 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/11/19.
45
04/17/2019
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
46
04/17/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
47
04/19/2019
Order
48
04/30/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
49
04/30/2019
Errata
50
04/30/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
51
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
52
05/08/2019
Notice (Other)
05/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
05/14/2019
Order
05/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
05/20/2019
Errata
56
05/20/2019
Supplement

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.