Elaine Katrese Chandler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01821 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 163 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/27/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Elaine Katrese Chandler
3
04/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Elaine Katrese Chandler.
4
04/27/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Elaine Katrese Chandler.
04/27/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-01821-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22010620. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/04/2018 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 08/03/2018.
6
04/28/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
04/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 04/29/2018.
04/30/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Elaine Katrese Chandler Case Number 05-05778, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/15/2005, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee on 12/06/2006; Case Number 90-06989, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/08/1990, Standard Discharge on 07/13/1994; Case Number 01-06937, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/28/2001, Standard Discharge on 01/09/2002.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/30/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 4/30/2018.
9
05/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/02/2018.
10
05/14/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
06/06/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, James G Henderson, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0.00, Assets Exempt: $ 5626.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 19802.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 19802.00. (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.