Elissa Lauren Delve
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00013 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/17/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/17/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/17/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/18/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
01/18/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
01/22/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
01/23/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
01/31/2019
Request for Special Notice
14
01/31/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
15
01/31/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
16
01/31/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
17
01/31/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
01/31/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/31/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
19
01/31/2019
Affidavit of Service
02/01/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
02/04/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
03/06/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
22
03/13/2019
Proceeding Memo
23
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.