Elizabeth A. Thrapp
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2012-bk-00457 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
doc
05/23/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
45
06/25/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
46
06/25/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
47
07/18/2018
Certificate of No Objection
07/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
07/27/2018
Certificate of Service
49
07/30/2018
Compensation
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
08/08/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
51
08/08/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
52
08/13/2018
Certificate of Service
08/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
09/04/2018
Certificate of No Objection
54
09/17/2018
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.