Elizabeth Christine Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00100 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Undeliverable Mail
05/29/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/30/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
doc
05/30/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
doc
05/30/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
05/31/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
doc
06/04/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
33
06/05/2018
Entry of Appearance
34
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
06/06/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
06/06/2018
Comply (SA)
36
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/07/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
38
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
06/19/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
40
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
41
07/06/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
42
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
43
07/17/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
07/18/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.