Elliott Shawn Woodmansee
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00348 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/14/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/14/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/15/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/15/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
8
10/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
10/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
10/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
10/29/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
10/29/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
13
10/29/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
14
10/29/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
15
10/29/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
16
10/29/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
17
10/29/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
18
10/29/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
19
11/09/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/04/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
21
12/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
22
12/11/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
23
12/11/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
12/12/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.