Ellison v. Taishan Gypsum co ltd et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

4:2016-cv-01839 (alnd)

ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Eastern District of Louisiana for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Eastern District of Louisiana. (SAC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2017: # {{1}} Exhibit CTO 36).

Case Case4:16-cv-01839-KOB ALN/4:16-cv-01839 Document Document 17 3 Filed Filed09/27/17 09/27/17 Page Page11ofof22 FILED 2017 Sep−27 PM 04:55 U.S. DISTRICT COURT N.D. OF ALABAMA UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION IN RE: CHINESE−MANUFACTURED DRYWALL PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2047 (SEE ATTACHED SCHEDULE) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO −36) On June 15, 2009, the Panel transferred 9 civil action(s) to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. See 626 F.Supp.2d 1346 (J.P.M.L. 2009). Since that time, 177 additional action(s) have been transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana. With the consent of that court, all such actions have been assigned to the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon. It appears that the action(s) on this conditional transfer order involve questions of fact that are common to the actions previously transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana and assigned to Judge Fallon. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Eastern District of Louisiana for the reasons stated in the order of June 15, 2009, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7−day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. FOR THE PANEL: Sep 27, 2017 Jeffery N. Lüthi Clerk of the Panel Case Case4:16-cv-01839-KOB ALN/4:16-cv-01839 Document Document 17 3 Filed Filed09/27/17 09/27/17 Page Page22ofof22 IN RE: CHINESE−MANUFACTURED DRYWALL PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2047 SCHEDULE CTO−36 − TAG−ALONG ACTIONS DIST DIV. C.A.NO. CASE CAPTION ALABAMA NORTHERN ALN 4 16−01839 Ellison v. Taishan Gypsum Co Ltd et al

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 288 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/14/2016
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 B4601075910.), filed by Bryan Ellison.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
11/15/2016
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601075910 (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/21/2016
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT
3
02/22/2017
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- More than 90 days have passed since the filing of the complaint and it does not appear that any deft has been served; Pltf is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within ten (10) calendar days, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/22/17.
4
03/03/2017
RESPONSE to re 3 Order to Show Cause filed by Bryan Ellison.
5
03/07/2017
ORDER- The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred and it appears that no such events will in the timely manner contemplated in the General Order; The Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this case to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/7/17.
6
03/07/2017
Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 4:16-cv-1839-KOB on all subsequent pleadings.
7
06/16/2017
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bryan Ellison.
1
Exhibit List of Additional Plaintiffs
1 Attachment
8
09/01/2017
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. More than 90 days have passed since the filing of this suit. Plaintiff must show in writing by Tuesday, September 12, 2017 why the following defendants should not be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 4(m) and is to include any and all efforts made to serve these defendants: Taishan Gypsum Co. Ltd., Beijing New Building Materials Public Limited Co., China National Building Material Group Corporation, Taian Taishan Plasterboard Co. Ltd., Qinhuang dao Taishan Building Materials Co. Ltd., International Material Gypsum, Inc., and Bedrock Gypsum Company, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/1/2017.
9
09/12/2017
Summons in English and Chinese Issued as to Beijing New Building Materials Public Limited Co.; returned to Plaintiff for service under the Hague. (SAC)
10
09/12/2017
Summons in English and Chinese Issued as to Qinhuang dao Taishan Building Materials Co Ltd.; returned to Plaintiff for service under the Hague.
11
09/12/2017
Summons in English and Chinese Issued as to Beijing New Building Materials (Group) Company, Ltd.; returned to Plaintiff for service under the Hague.
12
09/12/2017
Summons in English and Chinese Issued as to Taishan Gypsum Co Ltd.; returned to Plaintiff for service under the Hague.
13
09/12/2017
Summons in English and Chinese Issued as to Taian Taishan Plasterboard Co Ltd.; returned to Plaintiff for service under the Hague.
14
09/12/2017
Summons in English and Chinese Issued as to China National Building Material Group Corporation; returned to Plaintiff for service under the Hague.
15
09/12/2017
Summons in English and Chinese Issued as to State-Owned Assets Supervision and Adminstration Commission of the State Council; returned to Plaintiff for service under the Hague.
16
09/12/2017
RESPONSE to re 8 filed by Bryan Ellison.
17
09/27/2017
ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Eastern District of Louisiana for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Eastern District of Louisiana. (SAC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2017: # 1 Exhibit CTO 36).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.