Elly et al v. Lulu's Landing, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2016-cv-00196 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 663 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/06/2016
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1896315, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Elly, Christopher Thornton.
1
Exhibit Disclosure Statement
2
Exhibit Summons LuLu's Fun Food
3
Exhibit Summons LuLu's Landing
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112331263" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112331263','59322','8','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit Summons Southport) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2016: #
5
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112332921" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112332921','59322','8','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
5 Attachments
2
05/11/2016
Summons Issued as to Lulu's Fun Food, LLC, Lulu's Landing, Inc., Southport, L.L.C. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
1
Summons # 2
2
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112332967" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112332967','59322','14','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons # 3)
2 Attachments
3
05/11/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Hope Elly & Christopher Thornton. Ref to Judge Bivins.
4
05/11/2016
Service Order entered 5/11/2016. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/11/2016. Copy to Pltfs.
5
05/17/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly, Christopher Thornton. Lulu's Fun Food, LLC served on 5/14/2016, answer due 6/6/2016
6
05/18/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly, Christopher Thornton. Southport, L.L.C. served on 5/16/2016, answer due 6/6/2016
7
06/06/2016
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Hope Elly, Christopher Thornton
1
Exhibit Alias Summons Lulu's Landing
1 Attachment
8
06/06/2016
ANSWER to Complaint by Lulu's Fun Food, LLC, Lulu's Landing, Inc., Southport, L.L.C.
9
06/06/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Lulu's Landing, Inc.
10
06/06/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Lulu's Fun Food, LLC.
11
06/06/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Southport, L.L.C.
12
06/07/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Lulu's Landing, Inc.
13
06/07/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Lulu's Fun Food, LLC.
14
06/07/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Southport, L.L.C.
06/07/2016
REFERRAL OF 12, 13 & 14 Corporate Disclosure Statements to Judge Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
06/07/2016
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/7/2016.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112344310" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112344310','59322','48','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent Form) Copies to parties
1 Attachment
16
06/07/2016
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 7/22/2016.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112344330" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112344330','59322','50','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent Form) Copies to parties.
1 Attachment
17
06/08/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Carlton Hilson on behalf of Lulu's Fun Food, LLC, Lulu's Landing, Inc., Southport, L.L.C.
18
06/23/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Southport, L.L.C., Lulu's Landing, Inc., Lulu's Fun Food, LLC.
06/24/2016
REFERRAL OF 18 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
06/24/2016
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge on consent of the parties (Doc. 18). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/24/2016.
20
06/24/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Lulu's Fun Food, LLC.
21
06/24/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Southport, L.L.C.
06/24/2016
REFERRAL OF 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement & 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
06/24/2016
Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement 21 filed by Southport, L.L.C., and Corporate Disclosure Statement 20 filed by Lulu's Fun Food, LLC.
23
07/19/2016
Order VACATING: 15 Preliminary Scheduling Order & setting a Response NLT 8/19/2016 for the Pltf to answer the Courts Interrogatories. The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1), concerning initial disclosures, are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/19/2016. Copies to parties.
24
08/19/2016
NOTICE by Christopher Thornton re 23 Order, Set Deadlines, Set/Clear Flags, of Filing Answers to the Courts Interrogatories.
25
08/19/2016
NOTICE by Hope Elly re 23 Order, Set Deadlines, Set/Clear Flags, of Filing Answers to the Courts Interrogatories.
26
10/31/2016
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Defendants' Expert Deadline by Lulu's Fun Food, LLC, Lulu's Landing, Inc., Southport, L.L.C.
11/01/2016
Set Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2016 at 3:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Email call-in info. to follow. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/03/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 11/3/2016. Settlement Conf. will be set 12/14/16 @ 10am & Deadline for expert report 1/19 - Order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/16/2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for Extension 26. The deadline for Defendants' expert disclosures is EXTENDED to January 19, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/16/2016.
11/18/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 11/18/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
11/18/2016
Order re: Telephone Conference held on this date - Plaintiffs have made a settlement proposal to which Defendants will respond not later than November 30, 2016. (Telephone Conference set for 12/9/2016 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. should this action not settle.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/18/2016. Copies to parties.
30
12/09/2016
Order re: 29 Order stating the telephone conference is CANCELLED due to this action being settled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/9/2016. Copies to parties.
31
12/09/2016
Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/9/2016. Copies to parties.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.