Elly v. Boardwalk Association, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

1:2016-cv-00311 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/23/2016
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1917834, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Elly.
1
Exhibit Disclosure Statement
2
Exhibit Summons Boardwalk
3
Exhibit Summons Sea N Suds
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112351457" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112351457','59551','7','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit Summons Young's Suncoast) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2016: #
5
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112351879" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112351879','59551','7','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
5 Attachments
2
06/24/2016
Summonses Issued as to Boardwalk Association, Inc., Sea N' Suds, Inc., Young's Suncoast Realty, Inc. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
06/24/2016
Service Notice issued 6/24/2016. Plaintiff's Notice of Service Attempt due by 8/8/2016.
4
07/01/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. Boardwalk Association, Inc. served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016
5
07/01/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. Sea N' Suds, Inc. served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016
6
07/01/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. Young's Suncoast Realty, Inc. served on 6/29/2016, answer due 7/20/2016
7
07/15/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Boardwalk Association, Inc., Young's Suncoast Realty, Inc.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
07/15/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/18/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sea N' Suds, Inc.
07/18/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/19/2016
ORDER GRANTING Dfts' 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Dfts to respond to Plf's complaint is extended to 8/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/19/2016.
10
08/16/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Boardwalk Association, Inc.
11
08/16/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Young's Suncoast Realty, Inc.
12
08/22/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sea N' Suds, Inc.
08/24/2016
REFERRAL OF 10 Answer to Complaint by Boardwalk Association, Inc., 11 Answer to Complaint by Young's Suncoast Realty, Inc., and 12 Answer to Complaint Sea N' Suds, Inc. to Judge Cassady. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
08/25/2016
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Plaintiff's answer to Court Interrogatories due by 9/26/2016. Defendants are to grant access to facilities to plaintiff's counsel and her expert for inspection within 30 days of defendants' receipt of interrogatory answers. Plaintiff is to provide defendants with copy of expert's report as set out in order within 45 days of inspection. Defendants' written response to plaintiff's expert report due within 30 days from receipt of report. Within 30 days after the defendants' written response, the parties shall mediate this ADA dispute, either before a mediator or by filing a request for settlement conference with the Court. Status report of mediation due 7 days of the mediation conference. If settlement is not achieved, the Court will conduct a scheduling conference and issue a supplemental scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/25/2016. (Attachment: # 1 consent form)
14
09/06/2016
First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Boardwalk Association, Inc.
15
09/06/2016
First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Young's Suncoast Realty, Inc.
16
09/07/2016
Order, directing Defendants Boardwalk Association, Inc., Youngs Suncoast Realty, Inc., and Sea N Suds, Inc. to file their individual corporate disclosure statements on the Courts form by 9/14/2016; directing Clerk to correct Defendants' names on the docket as set out;and Ordering parties to identify the Defendants' proper names on all future pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/7/2016. (Attachment: # 1 blank disclosure statement form)
17
09/09/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Boardwalk Condominium Owners, Inc.
18
09/09/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Suncoast Vacation Rentals, L.L.C., Bodenhamer Coastal Enterprises, LLC, G. Bodenhamer, LLC, GTK, LLC, JSW, LLC, David Bodenhamer identifying Other Affiliate Bodenhamer Coastal Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate G. Bodenhamer, LLC, Other Affiliate GTK, LLC, Other Affiliate JSW, LLC, Other Affiliate David Bodenhamer for Suncoast Vacation Rentals, L.L.C.
19
09/09/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Sea N' Suds, Inc.
20
09/09/2016
Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement 17 filed by Boardwalk Condominium Owners, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement, 18 filed by Suncoast Vacation Rentals, L.L.C., Corporate Disclosure Statement 19 filed by Sea N' Suds, Inc.
21
09/12/2016
Order, review of the 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Boardwalk Condominium Owners, Inc.; 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Suncoast Vacation Rentals, L.L.C.; and 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sea N' Suds, Inc. has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/12/2016.
22
09/21/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sea N' Suds, Inc.
23
09/21/2016
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady pursuant to 22 consent of the parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/21/2016.
24
09/26/2016
NOTICE by Hope Elly re 13 ADA Scheduling Order, of filing answers to Court Interrogatories
25
09/27/2016
MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Hope Elly.
26
10/04/2016
Order re: 25 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM filed by Hope Elly, (Response to Motion due by 10/17/2016, Replies due by 10/25/2016., Motion to be taken under submission on 10/26/2016.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/3/2016.
27
10/10/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM filed by Boardwalk Condominium Owners, Inc., Suncoast Vacation Rentals, L.L.C.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Response to Motion to Strike
1 Attachment
28
10/24/2016
MOTION to Dismiss SUNCOAST VACATION RENTALS, LLC by Hope Elly.
29
10/25/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion 25 filed by Hope Elly.
30
10/27/2016
Order 25 Motion to Strike, 27 response and 29 reply. Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2016 at 2:00 PM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. To access the conference, the parties shall use the numbers as set forth in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/27/2016.
31
10/28/2016
RESPONSE in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss SUNCOAST VACATION RENTALS, LLC filed by Suncoast Vacation Rentals, L.L.C.
11/03/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Telephone Conference held on 11/3/2016. (Digital Court Recording) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
12/14/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to Identify Expert and Serve Expert Report by Sea N' Suds, Inc.
34
12/16/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to Identify and Serve Expert Report by Boardwalk Condominium Owners, Inc.
35
12/21/2016
ORDER GRANTING Dft Sea N' Suds' 33 Motion for Extension of Time & Dft Boardwalk's 34 Motion for Extension of Time as set out The time in which Sea N' Suds & Boardwalk have to serve their written responses to Plf's expert report is EXTENDED by 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/21/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.