Elly v. Cobb Theaters Iii, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2016-cv-00459 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/30/2016
COMPLAINT against Cobb Theaters III, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1950562, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Elly.
1
Exhibit Summons
2
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112381878" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112381878','59907','6','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit Disclosure Statement) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2016: #
3
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112382022" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112382022','59907','6','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
3 Attachments
2
08/31/2016
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial.
3
08/31/2016
Summons Issued as to Cobb Theaters III, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
4
09/26/2016
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kimberly R. Ward on 09/01/2016 by Hope Elly. Waiver of Service due by 9/30/2016.
5
09/26/2016
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hope Elly. All Defendants.
6
10/28/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cobb Theaters III, LLC.
7
11/02/2016
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; re 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Answer due from Cobb Theaters III, LLC on 11/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/2/2016.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112408729" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112408729','59907','25','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge)
1 Attachment
8
11/30/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cobb Theaters III, LLC.
9
12/09/2016
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; re 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due from Cobb Theaters III, LLC on 12/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/9/2016.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112422830" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112422830','59907','33','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge)
1 Attachment
10
12/14/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cobb Theaters III, LLC.
11
12/19/2016
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 1/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/19/2016.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112427666" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112427666','59907','38','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge)
1 Attachment
12/19/2016
Answer due from Cobb Theaters III, LLC on 1/3/2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
01/03/2017
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cobb Theaters III, LLC.
13
01/04/2017
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 2/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/4/2017.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112432737" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112432737','59907','44','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge)
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.