Elly v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2016-cv-00569 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/17/2016
COMPLAINT against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Receipt number Pay.gov Tracking ID: 25V2I7IB; Agency Tracking ID: 1128-1985504, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Hope Elly.
1
Exhibit Summons
2
Exhibit Disclosure Statement
2 Attachments
2
11/18/2016
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial.
3
11/18/2016
Summons Issued as to Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
4
11/28/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. served on 11/22/2016, answer due 12/13/2016
5
12/12/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
6
12/12/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. for Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
7
12/13/2016
ORDER on 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/13/2016.
8
12/14/2016
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 1/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/14/2016.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112424234" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112424234','60215','26','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge)
1 Attachment
9
12/16/2016
MOTION for Michael J. Chilleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1998872, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
10
12/16/2016
MOTION for Gregory F. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1998883, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
11
12/20/2016
Order entered re: 10 MOTION for Gregory F. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 9 MOTION for Michael J. Chilleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. The motions filed by Michael J. Chilleen, Esquire and Gregory F. Hurley, Esquire, are due to be PROVISIONALLY GRANTED. The motions for admission pro hac vice are held IN ABEYANCE pending this Court's receipt of Mr. Chilleen's and Mr. Hurley's supplementations. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/20/2016.
12
01/13/2017
NOTICE by Hope Elly of Filing Answers to the Courts Interrogatories
13
01/24/2017
RESPONSE TO ORDER re: 11 Order, by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
1
Application for Admission to Practice for Gregory F. Hurley
2
Certificate of Good Standing for Gregory F. Hurley
2 Attachments
14
01/24/2017
RESPONSE TO ORDER re: 11 Order, by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
1
Application for Admission to Practice for Michael J. Chileen
2
Certificate of Good Standing for Michael J. Chilleen
2 Attachments
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.