Elly v. Pelican pub & raw bar LLC
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2016-cv-00135 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/30/2016
COMPLAINT against Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1878546, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Elly.
1
Exhibit Disclosure Statement
2
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112313747" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112313747','59078','5','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit Summons) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2016: #
3
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112314065" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112314065','59078','5','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
3 Attachments
2
03/31/2016
Summons Issued as to Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
03/31/2016
Service Notice entered 3/31/2016. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/16/2016.
4
04/14/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC served on 4/12/2016, answer due 5/3/2016
5
05/03/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC. (Cooper, Lisa Michelle)
05/03/2016
REFERRAL OF 5 Answer to Complaint to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/04/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC. (Cooper, Lisa Michelle)
7
05/04/2016
Scheduling ORDER: Initial disclosures WAIVED. Plaintiff's answer to Court's Interrogatories (Exhibit A) due 6/3/2016. Defendants shall permit Plaintiff's expert reasonable access to inspect facility within 30 days of receipt of interrogatories. Expert report due to Defendant within 45 days of inspection. Defendant's response to report due 30 days of receipt of expert's report. Parties are to mediate dispute within 30 days of submission of Defendant's written response. Parties' notice to Court of results of mediation due 7 days after mediation conference. Supplemental scheduling order will be issued if case does not settle. Discovery STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/4/2016. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A - Court's Interrogatories)
8
05/05/2016
Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement 6 filed by Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC
9
05/06/2016
ORDER on 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/6/2016.
10
06/03/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Date for Interrogatories by Hope Elly. Modified on 6/6/2016
06/06/2016
REFERRAL OF 10 MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Date for Interrogatories to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
06/08/2016
NOTICE by Hope Elly re 7 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories
06/13/2016
REFERRAL OF 11 Hope Elly's Answers to Court's Interrogatories to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/01/2016
Order, GRANTING 10 MOTION for Extension of Time. The filed interrogatory answers (Doc. 11) are accepted by the Court. For the purposes of the Scheduling Order, the "Defendants' receipt of Plaintiff's Interrogatory responses" is today, Monday, August 1, 2016. The deadline to permit Plaintiff's as described in the 7 Scheduling Order is now Wednesday, August 31, 2016. All other deadlines described in the Scheduling order remain unaffected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/1/2016.
13
09/22/2016
MOTION for Settlement Conference by Hope Elly.
09/22/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 13 MOTION for Settlement Conference Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/23/2016
Order, GRANTING 13 motion for settlement conference, and setting SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 10:00 AM (Central Standard Time) on Tuesday, October 11, 2016, in chambers (Room 459, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602). Confidential settlement statements due from each party as set out in Order by 5:00 PM (CST) on Wednesday, October 5, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/23/2016.
15
10/04/2016
Joint NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Continue Settlement Conference by Pelican Pub & Raw Bar LLC (Cooper, Lisa Michelle) Modified on 10/4/2016
10/04/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 15 Joint Notice of Settlement and MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/05/2016
Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/5/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.