Elsezenia Alfhild Nagel
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00183 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
07/18/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
38
07/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
39
08/02/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
40
08/03/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
41
08/15/2018
Substitution of Attorney
08/16/2018
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
09/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
43
09/18/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
44
10/22/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
45
10/22/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
46
10/22/2018
Certificate of Service
10/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
10/23/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
48
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
11/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
11/18/2018
Certificate of No Objection

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.