Elvin Odell Morris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81420 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
07/08/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
24
07/11/2018
Order Rescheduling Confirmation Hearing (CRJ)
25
07/11/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
26
07/11/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
09/04/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/04/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
40
01/04/2019
Relief from Stay
01/04/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/04/2019
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
43
01/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
01/09/2019
Reducing Notice Time and Notice of Hearing
47
01/15/2019
Limit Notice
52
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.