Encouraging Alaska Development Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00390 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/06/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
11/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Corporation) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/07/2018
Entry of Appearance
7
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
11/20/2018
Extend Time
11
11/20/2018
Declaration
12
11/21/2018
Extend Time
11/21/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/27/2018
Extend Time
14
11/27/2018
Declaration
15
11/28/2018
Notice of Non-Compliance (LBF37)
11/28/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/28/2018
Extend Time
11/28/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
11/29/2018
Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)
18
11/29/2018
Schedule D (Form 106D & 206D)
19
11/29/2018
Schedule E/F (Form 106E/F & 206E/F)
20
11/29/2018
Schedule G (Form 106G & 206G)
21
11/29/2018
Schedule H (Form 106H & 206H)
22
11/29/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
23
11/29/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
24
11/29/2018
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)
25
11/29/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
11/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
12/05/2018
Generic Motion / Application
28
12/05/2018
Declaration
29
12/06/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
30
12/06/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
12/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
12/06/2018
Generic Motion
12/06/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
12/12/2018
Extend Time
33
12/12/2018
Declaration
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
12/19/2018
Extend Time
35
12/20/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
36
12/20/2018
Extend Time
37
12/20/2018
Declaration
38
12/21/2018
Extend Time
12/26/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
12/27/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
40
12/27/2018
Certificate of Service
41
12/28/2018
Hearing
42
12/28/2018
Certificate of Service
12/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
01/04/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
01/04/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/04/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
45
01/07/2019
Proceeding Memo
46
01/07/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
47
01/18/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
01/22/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
01/24/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
01/29/2019
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
01/31/2019
Relief from Stay
50
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
51
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
52
02/04/2019
Declaration
53
02/06/2019
Support Documentation
54
02/06/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
02/08/2019
Generic Motion / Application
56
02/08/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
57
02/08/2019
Certificate of Service
02/11/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
02/20/2019
Entry of Appearance

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.