Eric Allen Martin and Kelly Renea Martin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-05272 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/15/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Eric Allen Martin, Kelly Renea Martin
2
12/15/2017
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin.
3
12/15/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin
5
12/15/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin.
6
12/15/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin.
7
12/15/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin.
8
12/15/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/23/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/13/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
9
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/17/2017.
12/18/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Eric Allen Martin and Kelly Renea Martin Case Number 05-03482, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/08/2005; Case Number 05-06823, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/19/2005; Case Number 05-06823, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/19/2005, Standard Discharge on 10/28/2005; Case Number 05-03482, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/08/2005, Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/20/2005; Case Number 97-05008, Chapter 7 filed in North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court on 09/08/1997, Standard Discharge on 01/14/1998.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/16/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
12/18/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin).
12
12/18/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtors', has filed a document not in an upright position when filing the Employee Income Record. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtors', should refile the document scanning it in the portrait orientation. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerks Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 6 Employee Income Records filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin).
13
12/18/2017
Employee Income Records skew corrected Filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin.
14
12/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Eric Allen Martin, Joint Debtor Kelly Renea Martin). Notice Date 12/20/2017.
15
12/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/20/2017.
16
12/29/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert J. Solomon Filed by Creditor CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC.
17
01/02/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
18
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/10/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
19
01/19/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
20
01/19/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.