Eric David Buring and Deborah Susan Musgrove-Buring
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00326 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/29/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
09/29/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
09/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/29/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
09/29/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
09/29/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
6
09/29/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
7
09/29/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
8
09/29/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
9
09/30/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/01/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/01/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
14
10/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
16
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
17
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
18
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
19
10/19/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
20
10/19/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
21
10/19/2018
Certificate of Service
22
10/19/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
10/30/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
10/30/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
10/30/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
25
11/02/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
26
11/02/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
27
11/02/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
28
11/02/2018
Notice of Modified Ch 13 Plan With Objection Deadline
29
11/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
11/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
12/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
31
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
32
12/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.