Eric James Brown and Shari Lynn Brown
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00030 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Substitution of Attorney
05/24/2018
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
06/18/2018
Stipulation
69
06/20/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
70
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
71
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
72
10/24/2018
Hearing
10/25/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
11/07/2018
Proceeding Memo
74
11/09/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
75
11/23/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
76
11/29/2018
Declaration
77
12/06/2018
Affidavit
78
12/10/2018
Proceeding Memo
79
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
80
01/16/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
81
01/16/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
82
02/04/2019
Proceeding Memo
83
02/04/2019
Extend Time
84
02/04/2019
Extend Time
85
02/05/2019
Certificate of Service
02/05/2019
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
02/05/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
02/07/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
02/08/2019
Relief from Stay
88
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
89
02/13/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
03/20/2019
Hearing
91
04/04/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
92
04/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
93
04/05/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
04/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.