Eric Ray Allers and Grace Willowrose Allers
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00272 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/20/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
08/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
08/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
08/20/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
08/21/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
08/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/10/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
10/11/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/06/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
17
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.