Eric Sean Wolfinbarger
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00175 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/06/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
06/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/06/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
06/06/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
06/06/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
06/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/07/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
11
06/07/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
07/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
16
07/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
07/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
07/12/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
19
07/12/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
07/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
24
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
26
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.