Erin B. Reitzig and Christopher P. Reitzig
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

3:2018-bk-00171 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/01/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
06/01/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
06/04/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/05/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
06/05/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
12
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
06/17/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
14
06/17/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
15
06/17/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
16
06/17/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
17
06/17/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
18
06/17/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
19
06/17/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
06/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
06/18/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
21
06/18/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.