Ernest Blair Helmer, II and Sarah Nicole Helmer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00116 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
05/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/29/2018
Certificate of No Objection
doc
05/30/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
doc
06/04/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
doc
06/04/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
29
06/05/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
30
06/06/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
31
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
32
06/06/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
06/07/2018
Update Deadline (Plan Confirmed-Ch12 & Ch13 Cases Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.