Ernest Frank Thomas
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00310 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/18/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
09/18/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
09/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/19/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/19/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
09/19/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
09/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
6
09/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
09/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
09/19/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
09/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/19/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
11
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
09/20/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10/01/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/02/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
10/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
10/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/12/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
19
10/15/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
20
10/16/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
21
10/16/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
22
10/16/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
23
10/16/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
24
10/16/2018
Certificate of Service
10/17/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
26
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
27
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
28
11/09/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
29
11/09/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
30
11/12/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
31
11/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
32
11/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
11/14/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
34
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.