Ervin v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cv-00234 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
120
05/22/2018
Discovery
121
05/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
122
05/24/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
123
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
124
06/08/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
125
06/11/2018
Order on Motion for Discovery
126
08/22/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
10/04/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
10/10/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
11/20/2018
Summary Judgment
131
11/20/2018
In Limine
132
11/21/2018
Summary Judgment
133
11/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
134
11/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
136
12/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
137
12/19/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
138
12/25/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
139
12/25/2018
Declaration
140
12/25/2018
Declaration
141
12/26/2018
Declaration
142
01/14/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
143
01/14/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
144
01/14/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
145
01/17/2019
Hearing
146
01/17/2019
Hearing
147
01/18/2019
Order
148
01/22/2019
Hearing
149
01/22/2019
Hearing
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
151
02/06/2019
DEPS Notice
02/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
153
02/07/2019
Vacate
154
02/07/2019
Expedite
155
02/08/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
156
02/08/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
02/08/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.