Erwin Francis R Tiongson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00432 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
12/21/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
4
12/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/24/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
12/28/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
03/15/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
15
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
03/18/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
04/02/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
19
04/02/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
04/02/2019
Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
04/02/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
21
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
04/08/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.