Estate of Joseph Murphy v. State of Alaska, Department of Corrections et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cv-00010 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
05/17/2018
Scheduling Order
38
06/26/2018
Notice (Other)
39
07/11/2018
Discovery
40
07/11/2018
Declaration
41
07/24/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
07/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/01/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
44
08/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
45
08/02/2018
Declaration
46
08/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
47
08/07/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
48
08/12/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Discovery. (1) The court will conduct an in camera review on the conditions and terms set out in the order. (2) Corcoran need not provide any additional response to the interrogatories. (3) Plaintiff will not be awarded attorneys fees. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/12/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
49
08/13/2018
Notice (Other)
50
08/27/2018
Leave to File Document
51
08/27/2018
Notice (Other)
08/28/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
09/11/2018
Discovery
54
09/11/2018
Declaration
09/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
09/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
57
09/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
58
09/25/2018
Notice (Other)
59
09/27/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
62
10/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
10/24/2018
Notice (Other)
10/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
10/24/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
67
10/31/2018
Notice (Other)
68
11/01/2018
Seal Document
69
11/01/2018
Seal Document
70
11/01/2018
Seal Document
71
11/01/2018
Seal Document
72
11/08/2018
Stipulation
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
11/15/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
75
11/15/2018
Notice (Other)
76
11/28/2018
Notice of Appearance
77
12/19/2018
ORDER granting 53 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/19/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
78
12/27/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
01/10/2019
Notice (Other)
81
01/16/2019
Seal Document
01/17/2019
Order on Motion to Seal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
02/08/2019
Leave to File Document
85
02/08/2019
Notice (Other)
02/13/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
02/26/2019
Notice (Other)
02/27/2019
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
04/04/2019
Stipulation
91
04/17/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.