Esther Ngatuaehau Taliai
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00086 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/19/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
03/19/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
03/19/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
03/19/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/20/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
03/20/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
8
03/21/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
9
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
04/11/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
04/16/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
04/19/2019
Extend Time
15
04/22/2019
Extend Time
04/22/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.