Ethel Bernetta Kelly
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00402 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/19/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/19/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
11/19/2018
Credit Counseling Waiver Requested (109(h)) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/20/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
7
11/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
8
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
11/27/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
12
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
12/06/2018
Request for Special Notice
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/17/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
15
12/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
16
12/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
17
12/20/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
12/31/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
12/31/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
01/07/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
22
01/10/2019
Proceeding Memo
23
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
01/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
01/15/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
01/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
01/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
01/31/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
01/31/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
02/04/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.