Ethel Faye King
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04189 (alnb)

Notice and Order Granting Motion to Approve Loan Modification (Related Doc# [56]) Signed on 2/12/2018.

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: } } Ethel Faye King } Case No. 17-04189-DSC SSN: XXX-XX-3502 } } Chapter 13 } Debtor(s) } } } NOTICE AND ORDER NOTICE is hereby given that on February 9, 2018, that Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. filed a Motion for Approval of Loan Modification Agreement; it appears to the Court that said motion is due to be granted; now therefore, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Motion for Approval of Loan Modification Agreement shall be and hereby is GRANTED unless a written objection and request for hearing is filed on or before March 5, 2018. If said objection and request is timely filed, a hearing will be scheduled by a subsequent notice of hearing. Dated: February 12, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford D. SIMS CRAWFORD UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY JUDGE /ls Case 17-04189-DSC13 Doc 60 Filed 02/12/18 Entered 02/12/18 13:11:28 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Order on Objection to Claim(s) 3 Signed on 2/14/2018. Debtor's Objection to Claim #3 is sustained and the balance of claim #3 is disallowed. Debtor's Motion to Surrender Collateral is Granted. (RE: related document(s)[25] Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King, [26] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King).

17-04189-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Ethel Faye King } Case No: 17-04189-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-3502 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER This matter came before the Court on Tuesday, February 06, 2018 09:30 AM, for a hearing on the following: 1) RE: Doc #25; Debtor's Motion to Surrender Collateral of United Consumer Financial (Kirby Vacuum Cleaner) 2) RE: Doc #26; Debtor's Objection to Claim #3 of United Consumer Financial in the amount of $1,880.21 Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Bradford W. Caraway (Trustee) Brent William Davis attorney for Ethel Faye King (Debtor) Ethel Faye King It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: 1) Based on the filings and the arguments of counsel, and for the reasons set forth on the record during the hearing, the Motion is granted and the Debtor is authorized to surrender the Kirby Vacuum Cleaner to United Consumer Financial. 2) Based on the filings and arguments of counsel, the Objection is sustained and the balance of claim number 3 is disallowed. The Claimant has 60 days from the date of possession to file a deficiency balance claim if one is asserted. Further, in the event a deficiency balance claim is not filed timely and a discharge order is entered in this case, then the claimants right to payment on any deficiency balance is hereby waived. Dated: 02/14/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04189-DSC13 Doc 61 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/14/18 12:57:50 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[60] Order on Motion to Approve Loan Modification). Notice Date 02/14/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04189-DSC Ethel Faye King Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 35 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 14, 2018. db +Ethel Faye King, 3517 Burlington Drive, Fultondale, AL 35068-1984 cr Legacy Community Federal Credit Union, c/o Ryan Morgan, P.O. Box 653, Birmingham, AL 35201-0653 9509133 +ADT, 14200 E. Exposition Ave, Aurora, CO 80012-2540 9509134 +Brett's Pawn, c/o Manly, 205 20th St., N STE 723, Birmingham, AL 35203-4701 9509135 +Easy Money, 3355 Vanderbilt Rd, Birmingham, AL 35217-4329 9543205 Faulkner University, Attn: Annette Byslma, 5345 Atlanta Hwy, Montgomery, AL 36109-3390 9509136 First Choice bank, PO BOX 9201, Old Bethpage, NY 11804-9001 9509126 +Future income Payments LLC, 18300 Von KArman Ave STE 410, Irvine, CA 92612-0192 9509137 Jefferson Capital Systems, c/o Rausch, PO BOX 31277, Enterprise, AL 36331 9522940 +Legacy Community Federal Credit Union, c/o Ryan Morgan, Kudulis, Reisinger, & Price LLC, PO Box 653, Birmingham, AL 35201-0653 9509138 +Legacy FCU, c/o Cloud & Willis, 201 Beacon Pkwy W, STE 400, Birmingham, AL 35209-3129 9509127 Legacy Federal Credit Union, c/o Steven Springfield, 460 east, Mountian Brook Center, Birmingham, AL 35223 9509128 ++NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, PO BOX 619096, DALLAS TX 75261-9096 (address filed with court: NationStar Mortgage LLC, ATTN: Bankruptcy, PO BOX 630267, Irving, TX 75063) 9509140 Speedy Cash, c/o Ad Astra Recovery, 8918 W 21st St N STE 200 PMB 112, Wichita, KS 67205-1880 9509132 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 9630206 US ATTORNEY, 1801 4TH AVENUE N, BIRMINGHAM, AL 35203-2101 9509144 +Wayne's, 7650 Commerce Lane, Trussville, AL 35173-2830 9569059 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., PO Box 10438, MAC F8235-02F, Des Moines, IA 50306-0438 9509130 Wells Fargo Home Furnishings, PO BOX 660553, Dallas, TX 75266-0553 9522939 c/o Ryan E. Morgan, Kudulis, Reisinger, & Price LLC, PO Box 653, Birmingham, AL 35201-0653 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/Text: bnc@bass-associates.com Feb 13 2018 01:27:59 United Consumer Financial Serv., Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Rd, Suite 200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 9620151 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 01:32:38 Ashley Funding Services, LLC its successors and, assigns as assignee of Syndicated, Office Systems, Inc., Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9597254 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@cavps.com Feb 13 2018 01:30:08 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, 500 Summit Lake Drive, Ste 400, Valhalla, NY 10595-1340 9509131 +E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Feb 13 2018 01:28:23 Internal Revenue Service TCS, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6432 9565021 E-mail/Text: JCAP_BNC_Notices@jcap.com Feb 13 2018 01:30:05 Jefferson Capital Systems LLC, Po Box 7999, Saint Cloud Mn 56302-9617 9623353 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 01:32:37 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of OSI Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9615707 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 01:32:38 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of Arrow Financial Services,, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9570499 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydpt@mcmcg.com Feb 13 2018 01:29:05 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, PO Box 2011, Warren, MI 48090-2011 9509129 E-mail/PDF: cbp@onemainfinancial.com Feb 13 2018 01:26:12 One Main Financial, PO BOX 742536, Cincinnati, OH 45274-2536 9538997 +E-mail/PDF: cbp@onemainfinancial.com Feb 13 2018 01:25:56 OneMain, PO Box 3251, Evansville, IN 47731-3251 9509139 +E-mail/Text: jmoreno@hillcrestdavidson.com Feb 13 2018 01:28:47 Protect your home, c/o Hillcrest DAvidson, 715 N Glenville Sr STE 450, Richardson, TX 75081-2898 9509141 E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Feb 13 2018 01:26:00 Synchrony Bank, PO BOx 965064, Orlando, FL 32896-5064 9509142 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydpt@mcmcg.com Feb 13 2018 01:29:05 Synchrony Bank, c/o MCM, 2365 Northside Drive STE 300, San Diego, CA 92108-2709 9509143 +E-mail/Text: EBankruptcy@UCFS.NET Feb 13 2018 01:31:13 United COnsumer financial Services, 865 Bassett Rd, Westlake, OH 44145-1194 9536659 +E-mail/Text: bnc@bass-associates.com Feb 13 2018 01:27:59 United Consumer Financial Services, Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Suite 200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 TOTAL: 15 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9550974* ++NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, PO BOX 619096, DALLAS TX 75261-9096 (address filed with court: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Bankruptcy Department, P.O Box 619096, Dallas, TX 75261-9741) TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Case 17-04189-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 35 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (continued) ***** Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 14, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 12, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Ethel Faye King brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC, As Servicer for USAA Federal Savings Bank ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Jonathan Mancil Smothers on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper Servicer for USAA Federal Savings Bank jsmothers@logs.com, ncbkmail@shapiro-ingle.com Jonathan Mancil Smothers on behalf of Creditor USAA Federal Savings Bank jsmothers@logs.com, ncbkmail@shapiro-ingle.com Michael McCormick on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC BankruptcyECFMail@mccallaraymer.com, mjm@mccallaraymer.com Ryan Morgan on behalf of Creditor Legacy Community Federal Credit Union rmorgan@trimmier.com TOTAL: 8 Case 17-04189-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: } } Ethel Faye King } Case No. 17-04189-DSC SSN: XXX-XX-3502 } } Chapter 13 } Debtor(s) } } } NOTICE AND ORDER NOTICE is hereby given that on February 9, 2018, that Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. filed a Motion for Approval of Loan Modification Agreement; it appears to the Court that said motion is due to be granted; now therefore, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Motion for Approval of Loan Modification Agreement shall be and hereby is GRANTED unless a written objection and request for hearing is filed on or before March 5, 2018. If said objection and request is timely filed, a hearing will be scheduled by a subsequent notice of hearing. Dated: February 12, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford D. SIMS CRAWFORD UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY JUDGE /ls Case 17-04189-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/29/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Ethel Faye King
2
09/29/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
3
09/29/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King
5
09/29/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
6
09/29/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
7
09/29/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
8
09/29/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
9
09/29/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/08/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/06/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/28/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/08/2018.
10
09/30/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
10/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/01/2017.
12
10/02/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King).
13
10/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King). Notice Date 10/04/2017.
14
10/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/04/2017.
15
10/05/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper Servicer for USAA Federal Savings Bank.
16
10/11/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ryan Morgan Filed by Creditor Legacy Community Federal Credit Union.
17
10/13/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael McCormick Filed by Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC.
18
10/23/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor United Consumer Financial Serv.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
19
10/31/2017
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
20
11/09/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/08/2017. (Ch13troffice, sc)
21
11/13/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
22
11/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
23
11/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/15/2017.
24
11/26/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
25
11/26/2017
Motion to Surrender collateral of United Consumer Financial Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King
26
11/26/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 3 of United Consumer Financial in the amount of $1,880.21 Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King. Modified on 11/28/2017 to correct spelling
27
11/27/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent Davis, Attorney, when filing the Amended Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Surrender and Objection to Claim the certificate of service on all pleadings state - "a copy of attached was served electronically or by regular United States mail to all interested parties, the Trustee and all creditors required" but there was nothing "attached". SOLUTION: The filer, Brent Davis, Attorney, should file a proper certificate of service on each pleading. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 24 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King, 25 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King, 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King).
28
11/28/2017
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King (RE: related document(s) 24 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, 25 Motion to Surrender collateral of United Consumer financial, 26 Objection to Claim).
29
11/28/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR* Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King, 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (sva) Modified on 11/28/2017
11/28/2017
Corrective Entry - entered in error - misspelling of word in docket text (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Hearing). (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
11/28/2017
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King, 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
31
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
32
12/01/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/1/2017 (RE: related document(s) 9 Confirmation Hearing), 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/19/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
12/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/03/2017.
12/11/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 232.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04189-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (232.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21495375. Fee Amount 232.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
12/19/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/19/2017 (RE: related document(s) 9 Confirmation Hearing, 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
35
12/20/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/20/2017 (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King, 26 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
36
12/20/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King (RE: related document(s) 24 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.).
37
12/20/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
38
12/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/21/2017.
39
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
40
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #26; Debtor's Objection to Claim #3 of United Consumer Financial in the amount of $1,880.21. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
41
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #25; Debtor's Motion to Surrender Collateral of United Consumer Financial (Kirby vacuum cleaner). Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
42
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Confirmation Hearing. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
43
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #21; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
01/18/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04189-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21618322. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 40 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
45
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 41 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
46
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
47
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
48
01/19/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 12 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
49
02/01/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 11 of LVNV Funding in the amount of $429.52 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
50
02/02/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper.
51
02/02/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 49 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
52
02/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 51 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/04/2018.
53
02/06/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King (RE: related document(s) 36 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King (RE: related document(s) 24 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.).).
54
02/06/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of IRS in the amount of $13,455.92 Filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King.
55
02/07/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 54 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
56
02/09/2018
Motion to Approve Loan Modification with Nationstar Mortgage LLC, As Servicer for USAA Federal Savings Bank Filed by Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC, As Servicer for USAA Federal Savings Bank
1
Loan Modification Agreement
1 Attachment
57
02/09/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/9/2018 (RE: related document(s) 9 Confirmation Hearing), 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
58
02/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 55 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/09/2018.
59
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 57 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
60
02/12/2018
Notice and Order Granting Motion to Approve Loan Modification (Related Doc# [56]) Signed on 2/12/2018.
61
02/14/2018
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 3 Signed on 2/14/2018. Debtor's Objection to Claim #3 is sustained and the balance of claim #3 is disallowed. Debtor's Motion to Surrender Collateral is Granted. (RE: related document(s)[25] Motion to Surrender filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King, [26] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ethel Faye King).
62
02/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[60] Order on Motion to Approve Loan Modification). Notice Date 02/14/2018.
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/22/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/28/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/28/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.