Eugenia Hood
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04992 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 148 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
1
11/21/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Eugenia Hood
2
11/21/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood.
3
11/21/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood
5
11/21/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood.
6
11/21/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood.
7
11/21/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood.
8
11/21/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood.
9
11/21/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood.
10
11/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/20/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/21/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/20/2018.
11/22/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Eugenia Hood Case Number 10-03957, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/30/2010, Standard Discharge on 09/29/2010; Case Number 98-07860, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/03/1998, Standard Discharge on 06/08/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
11/22/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood).
12
11/22/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
13
11/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/24/2017.
14
11/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood). Notice Date 11/24/2017.
15
11/22/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
16
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
17
12/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
18
12/26/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
19
12/27/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
20
12/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/29/2017.
21
01/11/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood. (Shinn, J.)
22
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 12:24:29 PM ]. File Size [ 165 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:28 ]. (RE: Doc #18; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
23
01/19/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
01/22/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 149.74 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04992-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (149.74) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21630886. Fee Amount 149.74 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/23/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 2/23/2018 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood, 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
25
02/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 02/25/2018.
03/13/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 149.74 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04992-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (149.74) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21831456. Fee Amount 149.74 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 10.52 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04992-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (10.52) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21940248. Fee Amount 10.52 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
04/11/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 11 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
27
04/23/2018
Motion For Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay against Spire Alabama, Inc. Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood
29
04/24/2018
Notice of Status Conference(related document(s) 27) (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay against Spire Alabama, Inc. filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood). Status hearing to be held on 5/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
30
04/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Status Conference). Notice Date 04/26/2018.
31
05/18/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 5/18/2018 (RE: related document(s) 27 Status Conference on Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood). Hearing scheduled 6/13/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
32
05/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 05/20/2018.
33
06/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Attorney Spire Alabama Inc., c/o Incorp Services Inc.
34
06/13/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/13/2018 10:45:18 AM ]. File Size [ 775 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:09 ]. (RE: Doc #27; Status Conference on Debtor's Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay against Spire Alabama, Inc.). (adiuser).
35
06/15/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/15/2018 (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood). Hearing scheduled 6/25/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
06/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/17/2018.
37
06/20/2018
Application to Employ Daniel Patrick Evans as Attorney APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL PERSON Filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood
39
06/21/2018
Notice of Status Conference(related document(s) 37) (RE: related document(s) 37 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood). Status hearing to be held on 6/25/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
40
06/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Notice of Status Conference). Notice Date 06/23/2018.
41
06/25/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 27 Status Conference on Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood). Hearing scheduled 7/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
42
06/25/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 37 Status Conference on Application to Employ filed by Debtor Eugenia Hood). Hearing scheduled 7/9/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
43
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 41 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/27/2018.
44
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/27/2018.
45
07/09/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/9/2018 10:45:14 AM ]. File Size [ 543 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:30 ]. (RE: Doc #37; Status Conference on Application to Employ Daniel Patrick as Professional Person). (adiuser).
46
07/10/2018
Order Approving Application to Employ (Related Doc # 37) Signed on 7/10/2018.
47
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 07/12/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.