Eva Marie Parks
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01552 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs
doc
05/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/25/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.