Evelyn M. Bradford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00062 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/28/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
02/28/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
02/28/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
02/28/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
02/28/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/01/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
03/06/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
9
03/06/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
03/15/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
15
03/18/2019
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
16
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
03/22/2019
Entry of Appearance

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.