Everly Jean Henderson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00355 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/19/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/19/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
10/19/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/19/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/19/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
10/19/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
10/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
10/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
10/20/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
10/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
11/13/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/16/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
15
11/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
16
11/30/2018
Entry of Appearance
17
12/03/2018
Employ (CM41)
18
12/03/2018
Declaration
19
12/06/2018
Employ
20
12/11/2018
Employ (CM41)
21
12/11/2018
Affidavit
22
12/14/2018
Employ
23
01/03/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
01/03/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
01/03/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
25
01/03/2019
Certificate of Service
26
01/16/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
01/17/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/22/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
01/24/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
29
01/24/2019
Certificate of Service
30
01/25/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
01/25/2019
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
02/01/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
32
02/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
02/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/13/2019
Certificate of No Objection
34
02/15/2019
Relief from Stay
35
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.