Fairmont Partners, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82014 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
07/16/2018
Bankruptcy Administrator Recommendation
88
08/22/2018
Limit Notice
140
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
141
12/17/2018
Notice and Order
143
12/26/2018
Reply
144
12/26/2018
Exhibit
12/26/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
146
12/26/2018
Reply
12/27/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
149
12/28/2018
Order (Generic-no hearing)
151
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
152
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.