Feldman v. cox Communications Incorporated
Court Docket Sheet

4:2012-cv-00760 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 645 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/15/2012
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 0970-7343686, filed by Stanley Feldman.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02519961471" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02519961471','733744','9','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
1 Attachment
2
10/15/2012
SUMMONS Submitted by Stanley Feldman.
3
10/15/2012
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-7343686. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Hector C Estrada. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:12-CV-760-TUC-HCE. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02519961547" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02519961547','733744','13','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Magistrate Form)
1 Attachment
4
10/16/2012
Summons Issued as to Cox Communications Incorporated. (PAA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
5
10/17/2012
ORDER ; Random reassignment to District Judge David C Bury. Magistrate Judge Hector C Estrada no longer assigned to case. Case designation: CV 12-760-TUC-DCB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hector C Estrada on 10/17/12. (SMBE)
6
10/29/2012
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Allan Kanner on behalf of Stanley Feldman.
7
10/29/2012
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia St. Amant on behalf of Stanley Feldman.
10/30/2012
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX127541 as to Allan Kanner. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2012
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX127535 as to Cynthia St. Amant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/30/2012
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
9
11/07/2012
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joe R Whatley Jr on behalf of Stanley Feldman.
11/07/2012
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX127900 as to Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/07/2012
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
11
12/04/2012
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Todd M. Schneider by Stanley Feldman.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
2 Attachments
12
12/06/2012
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jason H Kim on behalf of Stanley Feldman.
12/06/2012
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX128878 as to Jason Kim. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/06/2012
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
12/07/2012
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX128949 as to Todd M Schneider. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/07/2012
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
15
01/10/2013
NOTICE of Change of Address by Garrett Webster Wotkyns.
16
01/16/2013
CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) Transferring Case to the Western District of Oklahoma re MDL-2048.
01/16/2013
Case Transferred to W.D. Oklahoma via electronic transfer. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2013
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in W.D. Oklahoma. New Case Number: 5:13 cv 55. (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.