Felicia Charell Sanders
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2015-bk-01188 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 206 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/25/2015
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Felicia Charell Sanders (Shinn, J.)
3
03/25/2015
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
4
03/25/2015
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
03/25/2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(15-01188-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17812705. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2015
** INCORRECT NOTICE AS TO JUDGE ASSIGNMENT ** Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/22/2015 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/12/2015 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 1 (TBB) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/21/2015. Government Proof of Claim due by 09/21/2015 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 06/22/2015. Modified on 3/26/2015 (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
03/25/2015
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
6
03/25/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2013 Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
7
03/25/2015
Debtor Request to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
8
03/25/2015
For cause, it is ordered that the foregoing case is to be reassigned and transferred from Judge Thomas B Bennett to Judge Tamara O Mitchell.
9
03/26/2015
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
03/26/2015
Amended Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/22/2015 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 6/22/2015.Proofs of Claims due by 7/21/2015.Government Proof of Claim due by 9/21/2015.Confirmation hearing to be held on 5/28/2015 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
11
03/26/2015
Composition Letter (plan proposes a pro rata share of $5,000.00 to unsecured creditors)
12
03/28/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 03/28/2015.
13
03/28/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Letter). Notice Date 03/28/2015.
14
03/28/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders). Notice Date 03/28/2015.
15
03/28/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 03/28/2015.
16
03/30/2015
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
17
03/31/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance.
18
04/01/2015
Notice of Incorrect Claim #1 filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc. PROBLEM: The filer has filed a claim or claim attachments not in an upright position (page 3). SOLUTION: The filer, Santander Consumer USA, Inc., should AMEND the claim scanning it in the portrait orientation.
19
04/03/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 04/03/2015.
20
04/22/2015
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/29/2015 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.
21
04/30/2015
Meeting of Creditors Held 4/29/2015.
22
04/30/2015
Debtor's Objection to Claim 5 of creditor Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $10,238.78 Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
23
04/30/2015
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders). Hearing scheduled 6/18/2015 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
05/02/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/02/2015.
25
05/05/2015
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.
26
05/05/2015
Rescheduled Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, 25 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/11/2015 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
27
05/05/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2014 Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
28
05/06/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor NCEP, LLC.
29
05/07/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/07/2015.
30
05/22/2015
Rescheduled Notice of Hearing on (based on hearing time) (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, 25 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/11/2015 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
31
05/24/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/24/2015.
32
06/02/2015
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Santander Consumer USA Inc (Claim No. 1) To NCEP, LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor NCEP, LLC by AIS Data Services, LP as agent.
06/02/2015
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(15-01188-TOM13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18073895. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 32) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/04/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor NCEP, LLC by AIS Data Services, LP as agent). Notice Date 06/04/2015.
34
06/11/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/11/2015 12:38:43 PM ]. File Size [ 531 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:29 ]. (RE: Doc #25; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
35
06/18/2015
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
36
06/18/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/18/2015 10:25:38 AM ]. File Size [ 91 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:15 ]. (RE: Doc #22; Debtor's Objection to Claim #5 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $10,238.78). (adiuser).
37
06/24/2015
ORDER Withdrawing Signed on 06/24/2015 RE: Doc #22; Debtor's Objection to Claim #5 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $10,238.78.
38
06/27/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Withdrawing). Notice Date 06/27/2015.
39
07/10/2015
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 7/10/2015 (RE: related document(s) 25 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
40
07/12/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 07/12/2015.
41
11/07/2016
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders. (Shinn, J.)
42
11/01/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
43
11/21/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
44
12/27/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP f/k/a AIS Data Services d/b/a/ Ascension Capital Group.
45
01/10/2018
Notice of Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7 Fee Amount $25.
01/10/2018
Receipt of Notice of Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7(15-01188-TOM13) [notice,ntccnv] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21589653. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 45) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
01/10/2018
Amended Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition., Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual Filed by Debtor Felicia Charell Sanders (RE: related document(s) 45 Notice of Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7).
47
01/11/2018
Convert Case Trustee Bradford W. Caraway removed from the case. Trustee James G Henderson added to the case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/05/2018 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/6/2018.
48
01/11/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 1/11/2018.
49
01/12/2018
Trustee's Letter to Cease Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
50
01/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 47 Convert Case). Notice Date 01/13/2018.
51
01/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 47 Convert Case). Notice Date 01/13/2018.
52
01/25/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.